THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 15:29:32 PM
Hassan, Ayman Emam Hassanien
CPSO#:
95040
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 May 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
24 May 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Medical Center
Suite 102
984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON P7B 7C7
Phone: (807) 935-8044
Fax: (807) 698 6399
Electoral District: 09
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:24 May 2011 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 May 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 May 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 23 May 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Sep 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Sep 2023 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Sep 2023 |
|
Active |