THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 9:27:00 AM
Al Jughiman, Mohammed Khaled A
CPSO#:
95024
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
03 Apr 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Arabian Gulf University College of Medic, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 May 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PEAP - R - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2017 to 25 Oct 2017
CF - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Cardiac Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 12 May 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Oct 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Apr 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2018 |