THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 22:15:10 PM
AlNasser, Abdullah E A H
CPSO#:
95020
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
16 Aug 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 Mar 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Kuwait University Faculty of Medicine, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:06 May 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:08 Oct 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 23 May 2011 to 17 Jun 2011
EL - Gastroenterology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Gastroenterology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 May 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Mar 2016 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 16 Aug 2018 |