THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 2:20:36 AM
Braverman, Aliza Shulamit
CPSO#:
95013
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
09 Aug 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
05 May 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Drexel University College of Medicine, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 May 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 May 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 04 Nov 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 May 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Apr 2014 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 30 Apr 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Aug 2015 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 09 Aug 2022 |