THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 14:53:57 PM
Palazzolo Penafiel, Jorge Alberto
CPSO#:
95009
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
30 Apr 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
14 Jun 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: National University of Cuyo, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 May 2011 to 29 Jun 2011
PEAP - CF - Cardiology
McMaster University, 30 Jun 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Cardiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Apr 2013
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 May 2013 to 30 Apr 2014
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 04 May 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Apr 2014 |