THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 11:32:50 AM
Nguegno, Anatole
CPSO#:
95006
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
11 Nov 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 May 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Universite De Yaounde I, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Dec 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 May 2011 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 11 Nov 2023 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: November 11, 2023
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Anatole Nguegno to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 11th, 2023:
The College received information that Dr. Nguegno engaged in unprofessional conduct in their interactions with the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Saskatchewan and in their billing. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Nguegno agreed to resign and never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario.
Download Full Document (PDF)