THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 7:48:15 AM
Golian, Mehrdad
CPSO#:
94996
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: University of Manitoba, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
University Ottawa Heart Institute
Division of Cardiology
40 Rue Ruskin Street
Ottawa, ON. K1Y4W7
Ottawa ON K1Y4W7
Phone: (613) 696-7271
Fax: (613)696-7123
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Manitoba
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
University of Ottawa,Heart Institute |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:05 Nov 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MEHRDAD GOLIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLIAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 05 May 2011 to 01 Jun 2011
EL - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 02 Jun 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
EL - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 May 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2015 |