THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 23:03:37 PM
Mahzari, Moeber Mohammed Mosa
CPSO#:
94991
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
22 Sep 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Jul 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: King Khalid University College of Medici, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:24 Sep 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:23 Sep 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 04 May 2011 to 31 May 2011
EL - Hematology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology
University of Ottawa, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 25 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Ottawa, 26 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 22 Sep 2015
CF - Endocrinology and Metabolism
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 May 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 May 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Sep 2015 |