skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 27/09/21 11:49:17 AM

Alsalamah, Mohammad Abdullah S

CPSO#: 94984

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Jan 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jan 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, Riyadh College of, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
201-9780 Bramalea Rd
Brampton ON  L6S 2P1 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Alsalamah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 18 2019

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Saudi Arabia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective:15 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD ABDULLAH S ALSALAMAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALSALAMAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 02 May 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PEAP - R - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Jul 2017
CF - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 May 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jan 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2018