THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 12:30:55 PM
Bakhsh, Abeer Mohammadidrees A
CPSO#:
94929
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 Dec 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: King Abdul Aziz University, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Apr 2011 to 14 Apr 2011
PEAP - R - Cardiology
McMaster University, 15 Apr 2011 to 31 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
McMaster University, 09 Oct 2012 to 07 Dec 2012
PEAP - CF - Cardiology
McMaster University, 08 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Cardiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Cardiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Apr 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Apr 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 May 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 09 Oct 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Dec 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |