THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
13/05/24 5:34:59 AM
Witt, Samantha Bernice
CPSO#:
94922
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Aug 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Aug 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Pivotal Kids Clinic
Unit 302
37 Jacob Keffer Parkway
Vaughan ON L4K 5N8
Phone: (905) 303-4400
Fax: (905) 303-4700
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SAMANTHA BERNICE WITT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WITT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 07 Apr 2011 to 04 May 2011
EL - Adolescent Medicine
University of Toronto, 18 Oct 2012 to 14 Nov 2012
EL - Paediatric Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Apr 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 May 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Oct 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Nov 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Aug 2014 |