skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 28/10/21 4:54:02 AM

Kurki, Sara Dede-Star

CPSO#: 94905

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saint James School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Etobicoke General Hospital
101Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kurki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 16 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kurki ( CPSO# 94905 )

Business Address:
Kirkland District Family Health Team
P.O. Box 10
2 Water Lane
Kirkland Lake ON  P2N 3M6
Phone Number: (705) 567-2224

Business Address:
145 Government Road East
Kirkland Lake ON  P2N 3P4
Phone Number: (705) 567-5251

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Englehart and District Hospital Englehart
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SARA DEDE-STAR KURKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KURKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 28 Mar 2011 to 19 Jun 2011
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 20 Jun 2011 to 27 Mar 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 27 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 28 Mar 2013 to 14 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2013