skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 04/08/21 9:21:49 AM

Saxena, Will

CPSO#: 94870

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Mar 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 03 Mar 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Delhi, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Wallaceburg Medical Centre
30 McNaughton Avenue
Wallaceburg ON  N8A 1R9
Phone: (519) 627-1497
Fax: (866) 539-6714 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

325 Margaret Ave
Wallaceburg ON  N8A 2A6
Canada
Phone: (519) 352-6400
County: County of Kent
Electoral District: 01

80 GRAND AVE W
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Canada
County: County of Kent
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: W. Saxena Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Saxena ( CPSO# 94870 )

Business Address:
Chathan-Kent Family Health Team
Wallaceburg Site
30 McNaughton Avenue
Suite 9
Wallaceburg ON  N8A 1R9
Phone Number: (519) 627-0200

Business Address:
325 Margaret Avenue West
Wallaceburg ON  N8A 2A7
Phone Number: (519) 638-8118

Business Address:
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Phone Number: (519) 352-6400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
Sydenham District Hospital Wallaceburg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:04 Feb 2014 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Mar 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Sep 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Jan 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 22 Sep 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2014 Active
             Dr.  Will  Saxena may practise medicine independently in family medicine, only,
            excluding emergency medicine.