THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 2:05:14 AM
Lakoff, Joshua Matthew
CPSO#:
94866
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Oct 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Oct 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
6-795 Gardiners Rd
Kingston ON K7M 7E6
Phone: 613 544 3400
Fax: 613 545 2204
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital |
Napanee |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 Jul 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:25 Oct 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOSHUA MATTHEW LAKOFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAKOFF is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 14 Mar 2011 to 05 Apr 2011
EL - Gastroenterology
University of Ottawa, 02 Jul 2012 to 25 Jul 2012
EL - Endocrinology and Metabolism
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Mar 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 Apr 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Jul 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Oct 2014 |