skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/10/21 23:58:13 PM

Brozek, Jan Ludwik

CPSO#: 94862

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Feb 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 28 Feb 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Jagiellonian University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
Health Sciences Centre
HSC 2C19
1280 Main St W
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 525-9140 Ext. 22936
Fax: (905) 522-9507 Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Poland

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:28 Feb 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Feb 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Feb 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Oct 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jun 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 05 Jul 2019 Active
             1.    Dr. Jan Ludwik Brozek may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine
                        and Clinical  Epidemiology  and Biostatistics, McMaster University,
                        in which Dr. Brozek holds an  academic  appointment  at the rank of
                        Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr.  Brozek no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.