THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 0:04:07 AM
Williams, Robin Lynn
CPSO#:
94797
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Apr 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Apr 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Queen's University, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
800 Commissioners Rd E
Children's Hospital/LHSC
Department of Paediatrics
Room B1-139
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: 519-685-8500
Fax: 519-685-8156
Electoral District: 02
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Robin Lynn Williams Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 24 2018
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:09 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Palliative Medicine |
Effective:25 Sep 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBIN LYNN WILLIAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLIAMS is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jan 2011 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 14 Aug 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Apr 2022 |