THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 8:59:02 AM
Zherebitskiy, Viktor
CPSO#:
94776
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
11 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
16 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Odessa Medical University, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 May 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 08 Feb 2011 to 07 Mar 2011
EL - Neuropathology
University of Toronto, 16 Jun 2014 to 11 Jul 2014
EL - Forensic Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Feb 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 Mar 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Jul 2014 |