skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 31/07/21 6:16:03 AM

Olokodana, Femi Adewale

CPSO#: 94732

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 May 2021
EXPIRY DATE
01 May 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Jan 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sint Eustatius, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Olokodana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 7 2021

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Saskatchewan
USA - Connecticut
USA - New Hampshire
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:14 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 May 2021