skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/10/21 16:25:55 PM

Mohammed, Samah Ahmed

CPSO#: 94730

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Feb 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Feb 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Baghdad College of Medicin, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 102
1 Centre Pointe Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 6E2
Phone: (613) 596-1320
Fax: (613) 596-3933 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

suite B
1395 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1H8N1
Canada
Phone: 613 422 3477
Fax: 613 422 5677
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kasim Nasser Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mohammed ( CPSO# 94730 )
Dr. K. Nasser ( CPSO# 94957 )

Business Address:
Suite 102A
1 Centrepoint Drive
Nepean ON  K2G 6E2
Phone Number: (613) 596-1320

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SAMAH AHMED MOHAMMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMMED is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Jan 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Jan 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2012