skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 27/06/22 17:11:47 PM

Rahimi, Eiman

CPSO#: 94721

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Jun 2022

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education: Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
60 Vancouver St
Yarmouth Regional Hospital
Anesthesiology
Yarmouth NS  B5A 2P5
Phone: (902) 742-3541

Additional Practice Location(s)

12-9080 Yonge St
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0Y7
Canada
Phone: (289) 597-7676
Fax: (289) 597-7675
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:28 Aug 2020 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EIMAN RAHIMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAHIMI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 15 Mar 2011
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 16 Mar 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2022