skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/10/21 12:28:13 PM

Lubanski, Martin Sebastian

CPSO#: 94694

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Jan 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 03 Jan 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Cardiac Centre
Unit 5
130 Ouellette Place
Windsor ON  N8X 1L9
Phone: (519) 250-4449 Electoral District: 01

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:03 Jan 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Jan 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Jul 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 May 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Dec 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 21 Dec 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 20 Dec 2012 Active
 Dr. Martin Sebastian Lubanski may practise medicine independently in cardiology
            excluding invasive cardiology, only.