THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 19:38:42 PM
Michaud, Josee
CPSO#:
94660
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Dec 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Sep 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Italian
Education: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
15-233 Brady St
233 Brady Street
Office # 15
Sudbury ON P3B 4H5
Phone: 705-222-9009
Fax: 705-564-9078
Electoral District: 08
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:18 Sep 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOSEE MICHAUD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MICHAUD is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Dec 2010 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Aug 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 06 Aug 2019 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Sep 2023 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: July 10, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:
Download Full Document (PDF)