THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 3:26:05 AM
Taylor, David Ronald
CPSO#:
94652
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Oct 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Academic Practice
as of
17 Oct 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Columbia University, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medicine
Etherington Hall, Room 1018
94 Stuart St
Kingston ON K7L 3N6
Phone: (613) 533-2780
Electoral District: 06
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: David Taylor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 22 2015
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority |
Moose Factory |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:10 Nov 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:10 Nov 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID RONALD TAYLOR may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the QUEEN'S UNIVERSITY in which Dr. TAYLOR holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;
(2) Dr. TAYLOR may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);
(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. TAYLOR no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,
(ii) When Dr. TAYLOR no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,
(iii) When Dr. TAYLOR no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jan 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Oct 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Oct 2016 |