skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 28/06/22 16:49:00 PM

ElSherif, Hanan El Sayed Abdelhamid

CPSO#: 94635

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Nov 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 29 Nov 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St-Joseph's Hospital
35 Algoma Street North
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5G7
Phone: (807) 623-9350
Fax: (807) 623-8449 Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Hanan ElSherif Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. H. ElSherif ( CPSO# 94635 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Hospital
35 Algoma Street North
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5G7
Phone Number: (807) 623-9350

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Atikokan General Hospital Atikokan
Geraldton District Hospital Geraldton
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective:14 Jan 2022 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Nov 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Nov 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Nov 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Sep 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Jan 2022

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 14 Jan 2022 Active
 Dr. HANAN EL SAYED ABDELHAMID ELSHERIF may practise medicine independently in physical medicine and rehabilitation.