skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 08/12/21 19:12:01 PM

Harbut, Ronald Eugene

CPSO#: 94606

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 12 Feb 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Feb 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Rosalind Franklin University of Med.& Sc, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Nov 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Feb 2013