THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 23:31:14 PM
Curran-Sills, Gwynn Martin
CPSO#:
94601
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Oct 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Oct 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill St
Brantford ON N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 752-7871
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brant Community Healthcare System |
Brantford |
Brant Community Healthcare System,Willett Site |
Paris |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:18 Jun 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:06 Oct 2016 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GWYNN MARTIN CURRAN-SILLS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CURRAN-SILLS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 22 Nov 2010 to 21 Dec 2010
EL - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 19 Dec 2011 to 15 Jan 2012
EL - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Nov 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Dec 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Dec 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jan 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Oct 2017 |