THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 5:47:05 AM
Kordy, Faisal Nayel Sulaiman
CPSO#:
94589
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
31 May 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Feb 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: King Abdul Aziz University, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2010 to 23 Jan 2011
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 24 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Paediatric Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Paediatric Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Dec 2012
CF - Paediatric Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 31 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Paediatric Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Paediatric Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Paediatric Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
CF - Paediatric Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Paediatric Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Paediatric Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
CF - Paediatric Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2018 to 31 May 2018
CF - Paediatric Infectious Diseases
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 02 Nov 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jan 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Dec 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Mar 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Dec 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Dec 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 May 2018 |