THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 8:44:49 AM
Ben-Meir, Assaf
CPSO#:
94572
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
04 Dec 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: The Hebrew University-Hadassah Medical S, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2010 to 03 Dec 2010
PEAP - CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 04 Dec 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Oct 2012
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Dec 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |