THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 5:50:17 AM
Shaban, Ahmed Mohamed Sadek Mohamed
CPSO#:
94542
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Dec 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Dec 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Compass Community Health
438 Hughson St North
Hamilton ON L8L 4N5
Phone: (905) 523-6611
Fax: (905) 523-8735
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:14 Dec 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AHMED MOHAMED SADEK MOHAMED SHABAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHABAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Nov 2010 to 21 Jan 2011
AVP - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 22 Jan 2011 to 31 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Nov 2011 to 31 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jan 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Oct 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Dec 2012 |