THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 5:37:41 AM
Shu, Gerard You Cheng
CPSO#:
94537
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: North Colombo Medical College, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
King Edward Health Centre
280 King Edward Avenue
London ON N5Z 3V3
Phone: (519) 451 1363
Fax: (519) 451 9395
Electoral District: 02
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Jun 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GERARD YOU CHENG SHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 19 Oct 2010 to 11 Jan 2011
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 12 Jan 2011 to 18 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 19 Oct 2011 to 18 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 19 Oct 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jan 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Oct 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 2013 |