THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 0:59:24 AM
Kayedi, Mandana
CPSO#:
94535
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: AHWAZ UNIVERSITY OF MEDICAL SCIENCES, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Department of Medicine
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: (905) 853-2204
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Markham Stouffville Hospital |
Markham |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MANDANA KAYEDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAYEDI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2010 to 22 Dec 2010
PEAP - CF - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 23 Dec 2010 to 28 Jan 2011
CF - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Dec 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Jan 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 Dec 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Dec 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2014 |