skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 27/07/21 14:56:41 PM

Kengran Sunjoh, Jude Thaddeus

CPSO#: 94517

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Jan 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Jan 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Jude Thaddeus, Kengran Sunjoh (used until: 07 Mar 2012 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian, Russian

Education:Patrice Lumumba People's Friendship Univ, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Casselman Medical Center
629 Principale road
Casselman ON  K0A 1M0
Phone: (613) 764-5440 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Jude Kengran Sunjoh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kengran Sunjoh ( CPSO# 94517 )

Business Address:
Casselman Medical Centre
628 Principale Road
Casselman ON  K0A 1M0
Phone Number: (613) 764-5744

Business Address:
St. Laurent Medical Centre
968 St. Laurent Boulevard
Ottawa ON  K1K 3B3
Phone Number: (613) 789-4385

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:09 Jan 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JUDE THADDEUS KENGRAN SUNJOH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KENGRAN SUNJOH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 26 Oct 2010 to 17 Jan 2011
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 18 Jan 2011 to 25 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 26 Oct 2011 to 25 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 26 Oct 2012 to 17 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2013