THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 13:12:37 PM
Gonu, Crystal Joy
CPSO#:
94507
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Oct 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Nov 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Baker, Crystal Joy (used until: 08 Oct 2012 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Saba University School of Medicine, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Lennox & Addington
County General Hospital
8 Richmond Park Dr
Napanee ON K7R 0A4
Phone: (613) 354-3301
Electoral District: 06
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: C.J. Gonu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 15 2024
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital |
Napanee |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:12 Oct 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CRYSTAL JOY GONU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GONU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 19 Oct 2010 to 10 Jan 2011
AVP - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 11 Jan 2011 to 10 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 11 Jan 2012 to 22 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 23 Oct 2012 to 11 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 19 Oct 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jan 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Nov 2012 |