skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 26/07/21 1:21:50 AM

Lam, Jennifer Ka-Ying

CPSO#: 94495

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Oct 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Oct 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Nottingham, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
555 Barrydowne Road
Sudbury ON  P3A 3T4
Phone: (705) 524-7419
Fax: (705) 524-9087 Electoral District: 08

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 96
Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3Z4
Canada
Phone: (905)707-8181
Fax: (905) 707-8180
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Jennifer Ka-Ying Lam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lam ( CPSO# 94495 )

Business Address:
550 Highway 7 East #96
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3Z4
Phone Number: (905) 707-8181

Business Address:
555 Barrydowne Road
Sudbury ON  P3A 3T4
Phone Number: (705) 524-7419

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:12 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JENNIFER KA-YING LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 18 Oct 2010 to 09 Jan 2011
AVP - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 10 Jan 2011 to 17 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 18 Oct 2011 to 17 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2012