THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 19:42:59 PM
Arabi, Nezhat
CPSO#:
94482
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 Oct 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
31 Oct 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Persian, Turkish
Education: Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
267 Fanshawe Park Rd W
London ON N6G 5A9
Phone: (519) 473-2929
Fax: (519) 472-3003
Electoral District: 02
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:31 Oct 2011 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Oct 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Oct 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 17 Apr 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 May 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 31 Oct 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 May 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Jun 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 20 Jun 2013 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Jun 2013 |
|
Active |