THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 5:33:07 AM
Crozier, Michael Scott
CPSO#:
94479
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Jun 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Unit 416
100 Arden Street
Moncton, NB E1C 4B7
Date Received: 31 Jul 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 04 Oct 2010 to 28 Nov 2010
EL - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 26 Sep 2011
EL - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 27 Sep 2011 to 16 Oct 2011
EL - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Oct 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Nov 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Aug 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Oct 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2014 |