THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 3:01:03 AM
Krishnan, Koushik Narayan
CPSO#:
94475
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Oct 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Jul 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: St. George's University School of Medici, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON K9V 4M8
Phone: (705) 328 6143
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site |
Bowmanville |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Ross Memorial Hospital |
Lindsay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Jun 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:20 Oct 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KOUSHIK NARAYAN KRISHNAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRISHNAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 18 Oct 2010 to 09 Jan 2011
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 10 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 17 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 18 Oct 2011 to 17 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 18 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 18 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 18 Oct 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jan 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 2013 |