THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 15:41:48 PM
Faruqi, Pervez Zafar
CPSO#:
94445
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Sep 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
24 Sep 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Karachi, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Paediatric Consultants
202 King Street West
Chatham ON N7M 1E5
Phone: (519) 351-9322
Fax: (519) 351-9323
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Chatham Public General Hospital Society |
Chatham |
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance |
Chatham |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:24 Sep 2010 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Sep 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 23 Mar 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Apr 2012 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 12 Apr 2012 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Apr 2012 |
|
Active |
Concerns
Source:
Other
Active Date: August 30, 2023
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Charges
Pervez Faruqi was charged with the following offences:
1. Assault, on or about August 16, 2023, contrary to section 266 of the Criminal Code of Canada.
2. Assault – Choking, Suffocating or Strangling, between January 1, 2023 and January 16, 2023, contrary to section 267(c) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
Date of Charge: August 30, 2023
Place of Charge: Chatham, Ontario
Chatham-Kent Police Service
Source:
Other
Active Date: August 22, 2023
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Bail Conditions
On August 22, 2023, the following Bail Conditions were imposed on Pervez Faruqi, and varied on November 1, 2023:
1. Dr. Faruqi must notify police of any change to his address.
2. Dr. Faruqi must not communicate, directly or indirectly, with named persons except through legal counsel with specified condition.
3. Dr. Faruqi must not go to a specified address with specified exception.