THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 8:34:06 AM
Hamam, Al Walid
CPSO#:
94441
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
100-405 Fort Whyte Way
Oak Bluff MB R4G 0B1
Phone: 2045602272
Fax: 2048155755
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Manitoba
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AL WALID HAMAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMAM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 27 Sep 2010 to 16 Oct 2010
EL - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 17 Oct 2010 to 05 Nov 2010
EL - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 29 Nov 2010 to 15 Dec 2010
EL - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 Nov 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 Nov 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Dec 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2012 |