skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 26/10/21 1:10:31 AM

Porter, Stephen Calder

CPSO#: 94413

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 04 Mar 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 14 Sep 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cincinnati, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Sep 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 12 Sep 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Nov 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Jun 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 25 Jun 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Mar 2016