THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 19:08:10 PM
de Wit, Kerstin Elizabeth
CPSO#:
94402
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Hogg, Kerstin Elizabeth (used until: 10 Mar 2014 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Edinburgh, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Victory 3
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-3232
Electoral District: 06
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:07 May 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KERSTIN ELIZABETH DE WIT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE WIT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2010 to 26 Oct 2010
PEAP - CF - Hematology
University of Ottawa, 27 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Hematology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Hematology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Aug 2013
CF - Hematology
University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 03 Sep 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Oct 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Sep 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 2014 |