THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 4:51:02 AM
Antar, Ramy
CPSO#:
94378
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Aug 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 Aug 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, French
Education: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicin, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 30 Aug 2010 to 19 Sep 2010
EL - Gastroenterology
University of Ottawa, 10 Aug 2011 to 09 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology
University of Ottawa, 10 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 09 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Aug 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Sep 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Aug 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 2012 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Aug 2014 |