THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 23:04:11 PM
Zavodni, Anna Elizabeth Helen
CPSO#:
94338
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Aug 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Aug 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
101-1030 Upper James St
Hamilton ON L9C 6X6
Phone: 905-962-2152
Fax: 1-866-677-2198
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
USA - District of Columbia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:28 Feb 2021 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANNA ELIZABETH HELEN ZAVODNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAVODNI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 27 Jun 2022
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 28 Jun 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2022 to 27 Jun 2023
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 28 Jun 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2023 to 27 Jun 2024
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Aug 2010 |