THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 9:57:13 AM
Weheba, Ihab Mokhtar Mohammed
CPSO#:
94299
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Sep 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education (Clinical Fellow)
as of
01 Sep 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic
Education: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. IHAB MOKHTAR MOHAMMED WEHEBA may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. WEHEBA is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;
(2) Dr. WEHEBA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. WEHEBA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. WEHEBA shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. WEHEBA ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. WEHEBA ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
Note: This certificate expires on 31 Aug 2024.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2021 to 23 Nov 2021
PEAP - CF - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 24 Nov 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
CF - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2022 to 31 Aug 2022
CF - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
CF - Respirology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2023 to 31 Aug 2023
CF - Respirology
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
CF - Respirology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2024 to 31 Aug 2024
CF - Respirology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2021 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2022 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2022 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 31 Aug 2024 |