THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 17:50:48 PM
kinaia, ban Micheal
CPSO#:
94298
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jan 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
05 Jan 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College o, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Elite Care Clinics
Unit 110
250 Tecumseh rd.East
Windsor ON N8X 2R3
Phone: (519) 971-2901
Electoral District: 01
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Kinaia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 16 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:23 Nov 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Aug 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Aug 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 05 Aug 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Jan 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Jan 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jan 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 31 Jan 2013 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jan 2013 |
|
Active |