THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 16:01:12 PM
Goyal, Kimmy
CPSO#:
94293
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Aug 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
22 Aug 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UNIT 1-5
10970 BRAMALEA RD
Brampton ON L6R 3X1
Phone: 289-569-0124
Fax: 905-789-7372
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jun 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Aug 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Aug 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 04 Aug 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Aug 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Aug 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Mar 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Mar 2012 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Mar 2012 |
|
Active |