THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 16:21:15 PM
D'Souza, Pernilla Marissa
CPSO#:
94287
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Apr 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Apr 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2000 Credit Valley Rd
Mississauga ON L5M 4N4
Phone: 9058195371
Fax: 9056085027
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Pernilla D'Souza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 23 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:29 Oct 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PERNILLA MARISSA D'SOUZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. D'SOUZA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 02 Aug 2010 to 27 Aug 2010
EL - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Aug 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Aug 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Apr 2017 |