THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 12:01:11 PM
Casey, Deborah Ksan
CPSO#:
94274
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Aug 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
82 Buttonwood Ave
West Park Healthcare Centre
Division of Respirology
Respirology Office
Toronto ON M6M 2J5
Phone: 416-243-3631
Fax: 416-243-3696
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
West Park Healthcare Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:03 Oct 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DEBORAH KSAN CASEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASEY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Respiratory Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 2012 |