THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 1:50:10 AM
Al Ghanim, Nayef Saleh A
CPSO#:
94256
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
05 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
16 Aug 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Arabian Gulf University College of Medic, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Nayef Al Ghanim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 20 2013
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 Jul 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:14 Oct 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Aug 2011 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 05 Jun 2014 |