skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 28/07/21 18:52:17 PM

El-Batnigi, Nemer

CPSO#: 94251

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Romanian

Education:University of Cluj, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
101-3420 Major Mackenzie Dr
Woodbridge ON  L4H 4J6 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. El-Batnigi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. N. El-Batnigi ( CPSO# 94251 )

Business Address:
65 Albert Roffey Cres
Markham ON  L6B 0H2
Phone Number: 6472175752


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:13 Aug 2008 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:12 Oct 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NEMER EL-BATNIGI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL-BATNIGI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2010